Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC et al v. Zora Lighting Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC and Lindsey Adelman
Defendant: Zora Lighting Co., Ltd., Laing Tang, John Does Nos. 1-5 and Liang Tang
Intervenor: YouTube LLC and Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04715
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is GRANTED as follows: Defendants, ZORA L1ghtmg Co, Ltd, Liang Tang, and John Does Nos l - 5, their agents, employees, representatives, privies, proxies, successors, and assigns, and all persons acting in concert, participation or combination with the Defendants having notice of this Order are hereby enjoined and prohibited, directly or indirectly; (And as further set forth in this Order.) IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/18/2019) (jca)
June 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/11/2019. Only the plaintiffs were present for the hearing. (ade)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Oliver Edwards VII dated 6/10/2019 re: Permission to file under seal a revised Proposed Order for the Injunction; Supplemental Declaration with Exhibits; a Supplemental Memorandum of Law. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/10/2019) (ama)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of COMPLIANCE. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rosen, Gary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC.(Rosen, Gary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bacon Oblak on behalf of Google LLC, YouTube LLC. (Oblak, Jonathan)
June 6, 2019 CASHIERS OFFICE REGISTRY DEPOSIT as per #20 Order to Show Cause Set Deadlines/Hearings dated 05/29/2019, from Judge Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, received $10,000.00 from Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC Receipt Number 465401236858 on 06/06/2019. (jkr)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zora Lighting Co., Ltd.. (pne)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE: Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause is GRANTED as follows: as set forth herein. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to show cause before this Court in Courtroom 21A, of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York at 500 Pearl Street/40 Foley Square, New York, New York on June 11, 2019 at 11 a.m., or at such other time that this Court deems appropriate, why a preliminary injunction should not issue, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a). In accordance with Section IV hereof, Plaintiffs shall serve copies of their Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and to Show Cause, this Order and all other pleadings and documents on file in this action on Defendants by email or via secured link to the dedicated website: as set forth herein. And such notice so given shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof pending or until further Order of Court. Any response or opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction must be filed and served on Plaintiffs' counsel by June 6, 2019 at 3 p.m., and filed with the Court, and hand delivery to Chambers 2270, along with Proof of Service. Plaintiffs shall file any Reply Memorandum by June 10, 2019 at noon with hand delivery to Chambers. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c), Plaintiffs shall post a bond in the amount of $10,000.00, as payment of damages to which Defendants may be entitled for a wrongful injunction or restraint. This Order shall be effective from issuance. And as set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/29/2019) (ama)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liang Tang. (dnh)
May 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary C. Rosen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Laing Tang. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Rebecca Satterlee in Support re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of and Order to Show Cause.. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Kevin Markow in Support re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of and Order to Show Cause.. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of and Order to Show Cause. . Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liang Tang, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary)
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary C. Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name contains a typographical error in the Summons caption, the defendant 'To:' section and the 'as to' docket entry (Lian Tang). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Presentation of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 5/23/2019. (ade)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #7 Motion for Kevin Markow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/23/2019) (js)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Rosen, Gary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of and Order to Show Cause.. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rosen, Gary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oliver Edwards, VII on behalf of Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Edwards, Oliver)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lian Tang, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dnh).
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosen, Gary)
May 23, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John Does Nos. 1-5 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC, Lindsey Adelman. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Rosen, Gary)
May 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Gary C. Rosen to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary C. Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Incorrect court district was selected (Southern District of Florida). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gary C. Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary C. Rosen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:1051; Dollar Demand $500,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1114; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary C. Rosen re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary C. Rosen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC, Lindsey Adelman, Zora Lighting Co., Ltd., Laing Tang. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 AMENDED MOTION for Kevin Markow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Notice to Attorney Gary Rosen re: Document #4 Proposed Order was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Temporary Restraining Order should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (km)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION for Kevin Markow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Markow, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Kevin Markow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16935534. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kevin Markow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16935534. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC.(Rosen, Gary) Modified on 5/22/2019 (bcu).
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of and Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Rosen, Gary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 5/22/2019 (km).
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lian Tang, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary) Modified on 5/31/2019 (pne).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zora Lighting Co. Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lindsey Adelman, Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC. (Rosen, Gary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laing Tang, Zora Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16934151)Document filed by Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC, Lindsey Adelman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Rosen, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC et al v. Zora Lighting Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zora Lighting Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laing Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Nos. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liang Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Adelman Studio LLC
Represented By: Kevin Markow
Represented By: Gary C. Rosen
Represented By: Oliver Edwards, VII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Adelman
Represented By: Kevin Markow
Represented By: Gary C. Rosen
Represented By: Oliver Edwards, VII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Bacon Oblak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Google LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Bacon Oblak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?