Intimo, Inc. v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Intimo, Inc.
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04734
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. In light of the June 21, 2019 teleconference, during which a substantively similar anticipated motion to dismiss the original complaint was discussed, the Court would not benefit from additional discussion of this motion at this time. Accordingly, Defendant is granted leave to serve their anticipated motion to dismiss no later than July 31, 2019. Plaintiff's opposition is due no later than three weeks following the date on which Defendant's motion is served. Defendant's reply, if any, is due no later than one week following the date on which Plaintiff's opposition is served. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 33. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/10/2019) (cf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #29 Amended Complaint Pre-Motion Conference re: Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand dated 07/09/19. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/1/2019. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (Daniels, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Motions for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed no later than 2/10/2020. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 11/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Status Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3-4 days. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/1/2019) (mro)
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Laleh Hawa, Esq., New Attorney: Laleh Hawa, Esq., Address: Cox Padmore Skolnik & Shakarchy LLP, 630 Third Avenue, 19th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10017, 2129536633. Document filed by Intimo, Inc.. (Hawa, Laleh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand and Laleh Hawa dated June 26, 2019 re: Initial Case Management Conference Joint Letter Pursuant to Rule 2.B. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #26 Amended Complaint against Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Intimo, Inc.. Related document: #26 Amended Complaint.(Hawa, Laleh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Intimo, Inc.. (Hawa, Laleh)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application denied. The potential service of an amended complaint does not materially impact the anticipated issues to be discussed at the initial pretrial conference, nor does it justify delaying the commencement of discovery. The parties are directed to submit the documents due in advance of the initial pretrial conference forthwith and in no event later than June 27, 2019. The parties are reminded that Rule 1(E) of the Courts Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases requires, inter alia, that "[a]bsent an emergency, [any] request [for an extension of time] must be made at least two business days prior to the original due date." SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/26/2019) (jca)
June 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Laleh Hawa to RE-FILE re: Document No. #26 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Harleysville Preferrd Insurance Company; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; due to deficient filing on due date, Court's leave must be granted. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Intimo, Inc..(Hawa, Laleh) Modified on 6/26/2019 (jgo).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 1, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. is adjourned to 4:00 p.m. that same day. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on June 25, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Laleh Hawa, Esq. dated June 24, 2019. Document filed by Intimo, Inc..(Hawa, Laleh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. For the reasons articulated, on the record, during the June 21, 2019 teleconference, Plaintiff is granted leave to serve an amended complaint no later than June 25, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant is not granted leave to serve a motion to dismiss the complaint at this time. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on June 24, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The teleconference scheduled for June 20, 2019 is adjourned to June 21, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on June 20, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. The teleconference scheduled for June 19, 2019 is adjourned to June 20, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on June 20, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2019. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman) (Daniels, Anthony)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #19 Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. TI1e teleconference scheduled for June 13, 2019 is adjourned to June 19, 2019. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 19. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/12/2019) (kv)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT MOTION to Adjourn Conference . Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Intimo, Inc.(Hawa, Laleh)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The teleconference scheduled for today, June 10, 2019 is adjourned to June 13, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on June 10, 2019) (Woods, Gregory)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Laleh Hawa, Esq. dated June 10, 2019 re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand, Esq. dated 06/05/2019. . Document filed by Intimo, Inc.. (Hawa, Laleh)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The Court will hold a teleconference to discuss the issues raised in this letter on June 10, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/7/2019) (anc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand, Esq. dated 06/05/2019. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to no later than June 12, 2019. The Court is mindful of the "strong policies favoring the resolution of genuine disputes on their merits." Traguth v. Zuck, 710 F.2d 90, 94 (2d Cir. 1983), which counsel against proceeding by way of default when Defendant has appeared and is willing to litigate. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand, Esq. dated 06/04/2019 re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including June 12, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint dated March 26, 2019. . Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Laleh Hawa, Esq. dated 5/31/2019 re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including June 12, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint dated March 26, 2019. . Document filed by Intimo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Service)(Hawa, Laleh)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laleh Hawa on behalf of Intimo, Inc.. (Hawa, Laleh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including June 12, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint dated March 26, 2019. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County on May 22, 2019. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than June 10, 2019. Additionally, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Defendant isdirected to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/27/2019) (ama)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/28/2019) (anc)
May 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Holdings (Delaware) Inc. for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Elizabeth Festa Ahlstrand to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc. for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/23/2019 (ldi).
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pending Motions. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Festa Ahlstrand on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 651753/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16937043).Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intimo, Inc. v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intimo, Inc.
Represented By: Laleh Hawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Festa Ahlstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?