Capital Art, Inc. v. Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.

Plaintiff: Capital Art, Inc.
Defendant: Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04751
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 7/17/2019 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (cf)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court has been informed that the Parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Courts calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending deadlines and conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/17/2019) (cf)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Capital Art, Inc.. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order. Document filed by Capital Art, Inc.. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the July 16, 2019, 10:30 a.m. initial pretrial conference is adjourned until July 23, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant, and shall file the affidavit of service for this Order no later than July 12, 2019. (Initial Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/21/2019) (cf)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/31/2019) (cf)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. Document filed by Capital Art, Inc.. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Capital Art, Inc.. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16939603)Document filed by Capital Art, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Art, Inc. v. Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Art, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?