Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv04914
Filed: May 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. For substantially the reasons stated by Malibu Media in its motion and in several decisions of this Court addressing the same type of issue raised in the motion, see, e.g., Malibu Media Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 68.175.19.48, No. 17cv7348 (GBD) (GWG) (Order) (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 23, 2017); Malibu Media Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 142.255.44.180, No. 17cv7344 (GHW) (Order) (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 6 2017); Malibu Media, LLCv. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 173.68.5.86, 2016 WL 2894919 (S.D.N.Y. May 16, 2016); Digital Sin, Inc. v. Does 1-176, 279 F.R.D. 239 (S.D.N.Y. 2012); Arista Records, LLC v. Doe 3, 604 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2010), Malibu Media's motion for leave to serve the subpoena is granted, subject to certain conditions, as set forth below. (as further set forth in this Order). In light of this Order, the Clerk of Court is directed to close Dkt. 7 on the Docket of this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 7/3/2019) Copies to Plaintiff's counsel (via ECF). (kv)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena on Defendant's ISP addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kevin T. Conway, Esq. dated June 17, 2019. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/28/2019) (kv)
May 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin T. Conway. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 26, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin)
May 26, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Kevin)
May 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Conway, Kevin)
May 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16958830)Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?