Diggs v. Ditech Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: Varnel Diggs
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04984
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 tt
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York. (gp)
June 3, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 19-10412. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (sjo)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Western; Case Number: 1:18-cv-00974. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 29, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
May 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 29, 2019 Transmission to the Civil Case Openings Clerk. Transmitted re: #20 Order Referring Case to Bankruptcy Court, to the Civil Case Openings Clerk for case processing. (sjo)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Transferring Case. Case Transferred to the Southern District of New York.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION Court Move to Abate Orders In Its Entirety (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that Plaintiff Varnel Diggs's claims and causes of action againstDefendant Nicole Bartee are SEVERED from this cause into a separate and distinct case to be styled, Varnel Diggs v. Nicole Bartee. Any future pleadings, orders, or other filings relating to Diggs and Bartee will be filed in the new, severed cause. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #6 MOTION Court Move to Abate Orders In Its Entirety filed by Varnel Diggs. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Judge: David A. Ezra. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2019, (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay by Ditech Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, S.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Varnel Diggs, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Nicole Bartee (Attachments: #1 Execution of Instrument, #2 Exhibit A #3 Envelope (cj). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Nicole Bartee. (Cockrell, Lisa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Intent to File Violations to State Commission on Judicial Conduct by Varnel Diggs (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Abate Counter-claim in its Entirety by Varnel Diggs. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing First, Action for Writ of Mandate by Varnel Diggs. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing First, Action for Writ of Mandate by Varnel Diggs (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANT DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND. Attorney S. David Smith added to party Ditech Financial, LLC(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Varnel Diggs by Ditech Financial, LLC.(Smith, S.)[Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Court Move to Abate Orders In Its Entirety by Varnel Diggs. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Disqualify Judge Yeakel. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Motion No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION Court Motion Judge to Comply (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #3 MOTION Court Motion Judge to Comply filed by Varnel Diggs. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral to: Judge David A. Ezra. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Court Motion Judge to Comply by Varnel Diggs. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service by Varnel Diggs. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100034484), filed by Varnel Diggs. (Attachments: #1 Execution of Instrument, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt)(cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diggs v. Ditech Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varnel Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: S. David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?