Range, Jr. v. BLDG 03 LLC et al
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Defendant: BLDG 03 LLC and 475 Soho, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05276
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by BLDG 03 LLC.(Wolf, Lawrence)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. BLDG 03 LLC served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Sverdlov on behalf of 475 Soho, LLC. (Sverdlov, Samuel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John William Egan on behalf of 475 Soho, LLC. (Egan, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of King Range, Jr.. (Hanski, Adam)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. 1. The Defendant(s) time to move against or answer the Complaint is stayed until the date of the IPTC, unless otherwise ordered. (as further set forth in this Order). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/20/2019) (kv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLDG 03 LLC. (dnh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLDG 03 LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen)
June 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Glen Howard Parker to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 475 Soho, LLC. (jgo)
June 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLDG 03 LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen) Modified on 6/6/2019 (jgo).
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 475 Soho, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by King Range, Jr.. (Parker, Glen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 475 Soho, LLC, BLDG 03 LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17022908)Document filed by King Range, Jr..(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Range, Jr. v. BLDG 03 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Range, Jr.
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLDG 03 LLC
Represented By: Lawrence P. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 475 Soho, LLC
Represented By: John William Egan
Represented By: Samuel Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?