Fasanello v. United Nations International School
Plaintiff: Joseph Fasanello
Defendant: United Nations International School
Case Number: 1:2019cv05281
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by United Nations International School. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference currently scheduled for August 2, 2019 is adjourned to October 3, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Courts June 13, 2019 order are due no later than September 26, 2019. ( Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/27/2019) (mro)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Douglas J. Klein dated July 26, 2019 re: Request for 60-day Stay of All Proceedings in Case. Document filed by United Nations International School.(Klein, Douglas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison M. Benz on behalf of United Nations International School. (Benz, Allison)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United Nations International School.(Klein, Douglas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by United Nations International School.(Klein, Douglas)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter filed by United Nations International School. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to July 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. (United Nations International School answer due 7/22/2019.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/20/2019) (anc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Douglas J. Klein dated June 19, 2019 re: Request for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Document filed by United Nations International School.(Klein, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Joseph Klein on behalf of United Nations International School. (Klein, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United Nations International School served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. Service was accepted by Barrington Calvert. Document filed by Joseph Fasanello. (Gourarie, Chaya)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/13/2019) (rjm)
June 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Chaya Mushke Gourarie. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:704; Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:2601; the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Nations International School. (pne)
June 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon L. Norinsberg on behalf of Joseph Fasanello. (Norinsberg, Jon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED NATIONS INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Fasanello. (Gourarie, Chaya)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gourarie, Chaya)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Nations International School. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17023996)Document filed by Joseph Fasanello.(Gourarie, Chaya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fasanello v. United Nations International School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fasanello
Represented By: Jon L. Norinsberg
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Nations International School
Represented By: Douglas Joseph Klein
Represented By: Allison M. Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?