Reyes v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Whitney Reyes
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United State of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv05325
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. United State of America served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service was accepted by Osrick Gordon. Document filed by Whitney Reyes. (Martinez, Ricardo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United State of America. (jgo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United State of America, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Whitney Reyes. (Martinez, Ricardo)
July 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ricardo Juan Martinez to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed initial pleading (Doc. 4);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/9/2019) (jca)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ad)
July 2, 2019 Transmission to Case Assignment Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order,,,,, to the Case Assignment Clerk for preparation of notice of case assignment/reassignment. (gp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case. (Martinez, Ricardo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against United State of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17085612)Document filed by Whitney Reyes.(Martinez, Ricardo)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (gp)
June 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
June 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (gp)
June 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ricardo Juan Martinez. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (gp)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Martinez, Ricardo)
June 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ricardo Juan Martinez. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ricardo Juan Martinez to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 6/12/2019. (jgo)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: Complaint. Document filed by Whitney Reyes. (Martinez, Ricardo) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Reyes
Represented By: Ricardo Juan Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?