Vernon v. Jordache Enterprises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Caliesta Vernon
Defendant: JORDACHE ENTERPRISES INC., Katy Zilinski and Hayley Nerenberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv05421
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hayley Nerenberg served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Katy Zilinski served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by Hayley Nerenberg Co-Worker. Document filed by Caliesta Vernon. (Phillips, William)
August 6, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/5/2019.(mf)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tanya N. Blocker on behalf of Jordache Enterprises Inc., Hayley Nerenberg, Katy Zilinski. (Blocker, Tanya)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jordache Enterprises Inc., Hayley Nerenberg, Katy Zilinski.(Colwin, Mercedes)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jordache Enterprises Inc..(Colwin, Mercedes)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jordache Enterprises Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Caliesta Vernon. (Stanciu, Silvia)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/12/2019) (jca)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jordache Enterprises Inc., Hayley Nerenberg, Katy Zilinski. (sj)
June 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Silvia Cristina Stanciu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983. (sj)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Silvia Cristina Stanciu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Caliesta Vernon; Jordache Enterprises Inc.; Katy Zilinski; Hayley Nerenberg. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text contained a typographical error. (sj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stanciu, Silvia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jordache Enterprises Inc., Katy Zilinski, individually, Hayley Nerenberg, individually, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Caliesta Vernon. (Stanciu, Silvia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JORDACHE ENTERPRISES INC., Hayley Nerenberg, Katy Zilinski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17053860)Document filed by Caliesta Vernon.(Stanciu, Silvia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernon v. Jordache Enterprises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caliesta Vernon
Represented By: Silvia Cristina Stanciu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORDACHE ENTERPRISES INC.
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Represented By: Tanya N. Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Zilinski
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Represented By: Tanya N. Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayley Nerenberg
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Represented By: Tanya N. Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?