Lion's Cathedral Production LLC v. Lemon et al
Plaintiff: Lion's Cathedral Production LLC
Defendant: Tom McGovern, University of Virginia Press, Micah Lemon, Does 1-10 and The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Case Number: 1:2019cv05454
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia answer due 8/15/2019. (rro)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/29/2019) (rro)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for defendant The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint to August 15, 2019 addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jennifer L. Bloom dated July 26, 2019. Document filed by The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia.(Bloom, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Isaac Gerber on behalf of Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. (Gerber, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for John Gary Maynard, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/17/2019) (ama)
July 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for John Gary Maynard, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid previously - see filing fee receipt number ANYSDC-17251880). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for John Gary Maynard, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid previously - see filing fee receipt number ANYSDC-17251880). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Maynard, John)
July 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for John Gary Maynard, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17251880. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Gary Maynard, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17251880. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Maynard, John) Modified on 7/16/2019 (wb).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter, filed by University of Virginia Press. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia answer due 8/1/2019. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/10/2019) (kv)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jennifer L. Bloom dated July 8, 2019 re: 30-day extension of time for UVA to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Document filed by University of Virginia Press.(Bloom, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #16 Amended Complaint, against Does 1-10, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit Cease and desist letter, #3 Exhibit Reply from Defendant)(Greener, Robert)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Leslie Greener to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit Cease and desist letter, #3 Exhibit Letter in Response)(Greener, Robert) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jgo).
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Bloom on behalf of University of Virginia Press. (Bloom, Jennifer)
June 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/19/2019, ( Status Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.). Plaintiff Counsel: Robert Leslie Greener; Defense Counsel: Shawn Patrick Regan, John Gary Maynard, III, and Robert M. Tyler and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during today's show cause hearing, Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/19/2019) (ne)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn Patrick Regan on behalf of University of Virginia Press. (Regan, Shawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Eric Brandt, Ph.D. in Opposition re: #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by University of Virginia Press. (Regan, Shawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by University of Virginia Press. (Regan, Shawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Caporale in Support re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. (Greener, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Complaint . Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. (Greener, Robert)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Leslie Greener to RE-FILE Document #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion. Use the event type Affidavit in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Leslie Greener to RE-FILE Document #4 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Robert Leslie Greener to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. #3 Signed Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. This document is not filed via ECF by the attorney. (ldi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Micah Lemon served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Tom McGovern served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; University of Virginia Press served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. (Greener, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC.(Greener, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Greener, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Caporale in Support re: #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. (Greener, Robert) Modified on 6/17/2019 (ldi).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. (Greener, Robert) Modified on 6/17/2019 (ldi).
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Order to Show Cause for preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC. Return Date set for 6/19/2019 at 10:00 AM.(Greener, Robert) Modified on 6/17/2019 (ldi).
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Robert Leslie Greener to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Micah Lemon, Tom McGovern, University of Virginia Press. (pne)
June 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne) (jgo).
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Micah Lemon, Tom McGovern, University of Virginia Press. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401237341)Document filed by Lion's Cathedral Production LLC.(pne) (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lion's Cathedral Production LLC v. Lemon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Virginia Press
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bloom
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bloom
Represented By: John G. Maynard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lion's Cathedral Production LLC
Represented By: Robert Leslie Greener
Represented By: Andrew Isaac Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?