United States of America v. Buff

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Carolyn Buff
Case Number: 1:2019cv05549
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 31:5321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: The initial conference is adjourned from July 25, 2019 to September 26, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/23/2019) (jwh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Casey K. Lee dated July 22, 2019 re: Request to Adjourn Initial Conference Scheduled for July 25, 2019. Document filed by United States of America.(Lee, Casey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carolyn Buff. (dnh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carolyn Buff, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Lee, Casey)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/17/2019) (jwh)
June 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Casey Kyung-Se Lee. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of U.S.. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (dnh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, Casey)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn Buff. Document filed by United States of America.(Lee, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Buff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Buff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Casey Kyung-Se Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?