Fagotto v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Matteo Fagotto
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv05551
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Parties shall call the teleconference line at (888)-398-2342 and enter pass code 9543348. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Lehrburger. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/8/2019) (rsh)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/30/2019) (ks)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Ewing, Bruce)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Ewing, Bruce)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Roy Millar Ewing on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (Ewing, Bruce)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JULY 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Gregory Ciocca on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (Ciocca, Henry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Peter D. Raymond dated 7/1/2019. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Raymond, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Dana Raymond on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (Raymond, Peter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Microsoft Corporation served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Document filed by Matteo Fagotto. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Microsoft Corporation. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Microsoft Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Matteo Fagotto. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17081523)Document filed by Matteo Fagotto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fagotto v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
Represented By: Peter Dana Raymond
Represented By: Henry Gregory Ciocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matteo Fagotto
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?