Ramashoye v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Anil Ramashoye
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv05559
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of New York. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 2, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Carolyn Kruk dated July 16, 2019. Document filed by City of New York.(Kruk, Carolyn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, General Agent. Document filed by Anil Ramashoye. (Rozynski, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, General Agent. Document filed by Anil Ramashoye. (Rozynski, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk on behalf of City of New York. (Kruk, Carolyn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew Rozynski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:12101; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:12131; the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anil Ramashoye. (Rozynski, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rozynski, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17083941)Document filed by Anil Ramashoye.(Rozynski, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramashoye v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anil Ramashoye
Represented By: Andrew Rozynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?