Reid v. Wild Attire, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valentin Reid
Defendant: Wild Attire, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05568
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wild Attire, Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Service was accepted by Morgan Dunn. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wild Attire, Inc. answer due 8/13/2019. (cf)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By August 13, 2019, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/19/2019) (cf)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Timothy J. Straub dated 7/19/19. Document filed by Wild Attire, Inc..(Straub, Timothy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Jon Straub on behalf of Wild Attire, Inc.. (Straub, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/18/2019) (rro)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/18/2019) (rro)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wild Attire, Inc.. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Paul Force. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Valentin Reid. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Wild Attire, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17084900)Document filed by Valentin Reid.(Force, David) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jgo).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wild Attire, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Force, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wild Attire, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17084851)Document filed by Valentin Reid.(Force, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Wild Attire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentin Reid
Represented By: David Paul Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Attire, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Jon Straub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?