Cutajar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Micky Cutajar
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv05569
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: The District Judge has referred this Social Security case to one of the Court's Magistrate Judges for a Report and Recommendation. Magistrate Judges are judges selected by the District Judges to serve for terms of eight years. Magistrate Judges are highly qualified and very experienced. You have an option to agree to having the Magistrate Judge to whom your case has been referred decide your case instead of recommending a decision to the District Judge who would then review the Report and Recommendation and address any objections to it. If you consent to having the Magistrate Judge decide your case, the Magistrate Judge replaces the District Judge, thereby speeding up the resolution of the case (because only one judge instead of two will be involved in your case). Any appeal from a Magistrate Judge's decision following consent is directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in the same way that an appeal from a District Judge's decision would be taken. If youdo not consent to having the Magistrate Judge decide your case, then the Magistrate Judge will issue a Report and Recommendation and the District Judge will consider any objections either party has to the Report and Recommendation before a final judgment is entered in your case. Both you and the Commissioner of Social Security must consent in order for the Magistrate Judge to decide your case. If you do not consent, there will be no adverse consequences. If you wish to consent, please sign the enclosed form and mail or hand deliver it to Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk's Office, Office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, 86 Chambers Street - Third Floor, New York, New York 10007. The United States Attorney's Office will arrange to have the consent form signed by the District Judge. (ama)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/16/2019) (ama)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Micky Cutajar. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 9/23/2019. (Olinsky, Howard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Micky Cutajar. (Olinsky, Howard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Olinsky, Howard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17084916)Document filed by Micky Cutajar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutajar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micky Cutajar
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?