Reid v. WWRD US, LLC
Plaintiff: Valentin Reid
Defendant: WWRD US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05573
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. WWRD US, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
June 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Paul Force to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons linked to deficient pleading; summons request must be linked to the pleading accepted by the court. A summons has been issued to this party, if another summons is needed, please file a request for Issuance of Amended Summons and include the word 'Amended' on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WWRD US, LLC. (dnh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WWRD US, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David) Modified on 6/20/2019 (dnh).
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WWRD US, LLC, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Paul Force to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested needs to be linked to the correctly filed initiating document;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against WWRD US, LLC. Document filed by Valentin Reid.(Force, David)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Paul Force to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/24/2019. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Paul Force. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Valentin Reid. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WWRD US, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valentin Reid. (Force, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Force, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against WWRD US, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17085356)Document filed by Valentin Reid.(Force, David) Modified on 6/17/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. WWRD US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WWRD US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentin Reid
Represented By: David Paul Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?