Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Calvin Klein, Inc.
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Defendant: Calvin Klein, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05575
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Calvin Klein, Inc. answer due 9/11/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/11/2019) (rro)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Timothy J. Haller dated 08/07/2019. Document filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp..(Haller, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is granted. Calvin Klein, Inc. answer due 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/11/2019) (jca)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Timothy J. Haller dated 07/08/2019. Document filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp..(Haller, Timothy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Calvin Klein, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service was accepted by Calvin Klein, Inc. c/o - Registered Agent - The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc.. Document filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. (Haller, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/19/2019) (ks)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Calvin Klein, Inc.. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy J. Haller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp..(Haller, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Calvin Klein, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. (Haller, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Haller, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haller, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calvin Klein, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17085415)Document filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Calvin Klein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Klein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?