Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP v. Tenenbaum et al
Plaintiff: Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP
Defendant: Josh Rosen and Jerald Tenenbaum
Case Number: 1:2019cv05577
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jerald Tenenbaum in Opposition re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Josh Rosen, Jerald Tenenbaum. (Morrison, Lawrence)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Josh Rosen, Jerald Tenenbaum. (Morrison, Lawrence)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On June 17, 2019, Defendants removed this case from New York State Supreme Court, and it was assigned to the undersigned. (Dkt. #1-2). On July 8, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion to remand the case back to state court. (Dkt. #5-7). The Court sets the following briefing schedule on the motion to remand: Defendants' opposition is hereby due on or before August 9, 2019, and Plaintiff's reply is hereby due on or before August 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 8/9/2019, Replies due by 8/23/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/9/2019) (jca)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Denise A. Schulman in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - arbitration agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - petition to enter arbitration award, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Bankruptcy Court order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - MRG disclosure statement)(Schulman, Denise)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP. (Schulman, Denise)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP.(Schulman, Denise)
June 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise Andrea Schulman on behalf of Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP. (Schulman, Denise)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Morrison, Lawrence)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NY Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652987/2019..Document filed by Josh Rosen, Jerald Tenenbaum.(Morrison, Lawrence)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Figowe Morrison to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Remove the case number (13CV). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/24/2019. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lawrence Figowe Morrison to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Office to be assigned was not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence Figowe Morrison. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 9:9; Arbitration code m (Mandatory);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1452; the Arbitration code has been deleted. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lawrence Figowe Morrison. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Josh Rosen, Jerald Tenenbaum, Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652987/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17096597).Document filed by Josh Rosen, Jerald Tenenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Verified Petition, #4 Exhibit Final Arbitral Award, #5 Exhibit Retainer Agreement, #6 Exhibit Demand for Arbitration, #7 Exhibit Interim Arbitral Award, #8 Exhibit Notice of Petition, #9 Exhibit Request for Judicial Intervention, #10 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #11 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #12 Exhibit Document List)(Morrison, Lawrence) Modified on 6/18/2019 (pc).
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Figowe Morrison. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Figowe Morrison to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 6/24/2019. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP v. Tenenbaum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph and Kirschenbaum LLP
Represented By: Denise Andrea Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Rosen
Represented By: Lawrence Figowe Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald Tenenbaum
Represented By: Lawrence Figowe Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?