Martinez v. United States of America Health & Human Services
Plaintiff: Ms Diana Martinez and Diana Martinez
Defendant: United States of America Health & Human Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv05582
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Discovery Notice & Individual Practices of Hon. Denise Cote served on United States of America on 08/08/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Diana Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents served on US Attorney's Office)(Genis, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. United States of America Health & Human Services served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Diana Martinez. (Genis, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/8/2019) (jca)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Genis, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America Health & Human Services. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert J Genis to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Civil cover sheet was not signed.;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert J Genis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:8715;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America Health & Human Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Diana Martinez. (Genis, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America Health & Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17087226)Document filed by Diana Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Genis, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. United States of America Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Diana Martinez
Represented By: Robert J Genis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Martinez
Represented By: Robert J Genis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?