Guevara v. Crommie et al
Plaintiff: Carlos O. Guevara
Defendant: Tankstar USA, Inc., Christopher M. Crommie and Bulk Logistics Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05583
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED PRE-TRIAL ORDER. Document filed by Bulk Logistics Inc., Christopher M. Crommie, Tankstar USA, Inc.. (Raven, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/18/2019) (jwh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by Bulk Logistics Inc., Christopher M. Crommie, Tankstar USA, Inc.. (Raven, Keith)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Keith Alan Raven. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Keith Alan Raven. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tankstar USA, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Raven, Keith)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tankstar USA, Inc..(Raven, Keith)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bulk Logistics Inc..(Raven, Keith)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 152495/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17087621).Document filed by Tankstar USA, Inc., Bulk Logistics Inc., Christopher M. Crommie.(Raven, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guevara v. Crommie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tankstar USA, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Alan Raven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Crommie
Represented By: Keith Alan Raven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulk Logistics Inc.
Represented By: Keith Alan Raven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos O. Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?