Mirchin-Work et al v. ATR New York, LH Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Mirchin and Cindi Mirchin-Work
Defendant: Atria Senior Living Group, Inc. and ATR New York, LH Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05584
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel T Leav on behalf of Lisa Mirchin, Cindi Mirchin-Work. (Leav, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference on September 6, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 518 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/1/2019) (js)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by ATR New York, LH Inc., Atria Senior Living Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Kelly)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andre J. Major. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andre J. Major. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ATR New York, LH Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ventas AOC Operating Holdings, Inc. for ATR New York, LH Inc., Atria Senior Living Group, Inc.. Document filed by ATR New York, LH Inc., Atria Senior Living Group, Inc..(Major, Andre)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Major, Andre)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 20713/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17088094).Document filed by Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., ATR New York, LH Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Andre J, Major in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' State Court Notice to Admit)(Major, Andre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirchin-Work et al v. ATR New York, LH Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Mirchin
Represented By: Daniel T Leav
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindi Mirchin-Work
Represented By: Daniel T Leav
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atria Senior Living Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andre J. Major
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATR New York, LH Inc.
Represented By: Andre J. Major
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?