Turn On Products, Inc. v. Full Circle Trends, Inc.
Plaintiff: Turn On Products, Inc.
Defendant: Full Circle Trends, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05594
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William H Pauley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Philip A. Byler, Esq. dated August 8, 2019. Document filed by Full Circle Trends, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Alleged Copyright Design, #2 Exhibit B-Defendant's Design)(Byler, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Turn On Products, Inc..(Schachter, Kenneth)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Full Circle Trends, Inc..(Byler, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Full Circle Trends, Inc..(Byler, Philip)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that: 1. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is extended to August 5, 2019. 2. Defendant waives the defense of improper service of process. 3. A facsimile or electronically transmitted copy of this Stipulation shall be deemed an original and may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. So ordered. Full Circle Trends, Inc. answer due 8/5/2019. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/25/2019) (rjm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Full Circle Trends, Inc.. (Byler, Philip)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Arwood Byler on behalf of Full Circle Trends, Inc.. (Byler, Philip)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Todd Miltenberg on behalf of Full Circle Trends, Inc.. (Miltenberg, Andrew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Marguerite Lieb on behalf of Turn On Products, Inc.. (Lieb, Katherine)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Full Circle Trends, Inc. served on 6/9/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service was accepted by Bethany Viteri. Document filed by Turn On Products, Inc.. (Schachter, Kenneth)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/19/2019) (jwh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Roy Schachter re: Document No. #4 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Docket Number field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney; the Date Filed field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney. Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Full Circle Trends, Inc.. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Turn On Products, Inc..(Schachter, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Schachter, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Full Circle Trends, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Turn On Products, Inc.. (Schachter, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schachter, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Full Circle Trends, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17088543)Document filed by Turn On Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Pattern No. PRT11-25-23, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Photograph)(Schachter, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turn On Products, Inc. v. Full Circle Trends, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full Circle Trends, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Arwood Byler
Represented By: Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turn On Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Roy Schachter
Represented By: Katherine Marguerite Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?