Sontag v. American General Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gershon Sontag
Defendant: American General Life Insurance CO. and American General Life Insurance Company
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Esther Waxman Trust I
Case Number: 1:2019cv05597
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff, Gershon Sontag as Trustee of the Esther Waxman Trust I, by and through his counsel, hereby gives notice that the above captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant, American General Life Insurance Company. SO ORDERED., American General Life Insurance Company terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/31/2019) (ama)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) American General Life Insurance Company. Document filed by Gershon Sontag. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Lipsius, Ira)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ira S. Lipsius to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Name Error; the defendant name listed on the Summons PDF and in the docket entry must exactly match the party of record. Do not use abbriviations. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American General Life Ins. Co., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Gershon Sontag. (Lipsius, Ira) Modified on 7/3/2019 (dnh).
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ira S. Lipsius to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; several sections of PDF were left blank: District Court selection, Defendant 'To:' section, attorney information. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American General Life Ins. Co., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Gershon Sontag. (Lipsius, Ira) Modified on 7/2/2019 (dnh).
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ira S. Lipsius to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank. 'As to' Error; the as to defendant name listed in the docket entry must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED BLANK SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American General Life Ins. Co., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Gershon Sontag. (Lipsius, Ira) Modified on 7/1/2019 (dnh).
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Gershon Sontag(Lipsius, Ira)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/18/2019) (ne)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lipsius, Ira)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against American General Life Insurance Company. Document filed by Gershon Sontag.(Lipsius, Ira)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ira S. Lipsius. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ira S. Lipsius to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected . Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ira S. Lipsius. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gershon Sontag, American General Life Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Ira S. Lipsius. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Esther Waxman Trust I. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ira S. Lipsius. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Esther Waxman Trust I. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17088928)Document filed by Esther Waxman Trust I.(Lipsius, Ira) Modified on 6/17/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sontag v. American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Esther Waxman Trust I
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gershon Sontag
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?