MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series PMPI and MSPA Claims I, LLC
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc. and Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05610
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc.. (sj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.. (sj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (sj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc.. (sj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eli Lilly & Company. (sj)
July 25, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eli Lilly & Company, re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alan Jay Kluger to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; second party name following that of the defendant in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF must include 'c/o', or 'via'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (pne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan) Modified on 7/23/2019 (pne).
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eli Lilly & Company, re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan) Modified on 7/23/2019 (pne).
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan) Modified on 7/23/2019 (pne).
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan) Modified on 7/23/2019 (pne).
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan) Modified on 7/23/2019 (pne).
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., re: #11 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan) Modified on 7/23/2019 (pne).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint,, against Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Series PMPI, MSPA Claims I, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Kluger, Alan)
July 22, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #4 Amended Complaint,,.Document filed by Series PMPI, MSPA Claims I, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc.. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint,,.(Kluger, Alan)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alan Jay Kluger to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request could not be processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alan Jay Kluger to RE-FILE re: Document No. #4 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. with alias 'formerly known as Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.' and party text 'a Delaware profit corporation'; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eli Lilly & Company, re: #4 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, re: #4 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., re: #4 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., re: #4 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., re: #4 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., re: #4 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Kluger, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series PMPI, MSPA Claims I, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit D-5)(Kluger, Alan) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jgo).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Complaint. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Series PMPI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Errata)(Kluger, Alan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kluger, Alan)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Alan Jay Kluger. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alan Jay Kluger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc., MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series PMPI, MSPA Claims I, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17090072)Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series PMPI, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kluger, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Alan Jay Kluger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series PMPI
Represented By: Alan Jay Kluger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims I, LLC
Represented By: Alan Jay Kluger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?