Hernandez Barrera v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Carlos Hernandez Barrera
Respondent: Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, William P. Barr and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv05611
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Carlos Hernandez Barrera. (Mathur, Suchita)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 Declaration in Opposition, #7 Response, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, . Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan. (Waterman, Brandon)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Deportation Officer Geraldo Paoli in Opposition re: #7 Response, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan. (Waterman, Brandon)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, ("Gov't Return"). Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Criminal history documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petitioner's BIA brief)(Waterman, Brandon)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan. (Waterman, Brandon)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #3 Letter filed by Carlos Hernandez Barrera. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/24/2019) (jca)
June 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Verified Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus & Letter Proposing Briefing Schedule served on Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, through service on counsel, U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY, Civil Division on June 17, 2019 & June 22, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Carlos Hernandez Barrera. (Mathur, Suchita)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Suchita Mathur dated June 21, 2019 re: Jointly Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Carlos Hernandez Barrera.(Mathur, Suchita)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Suchita Deolalikar Mathur. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Carlos Hernandez Barrera ; Thomas Decker ; Kevin McAleenan ; William P. Barr. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (dnh)
June 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mathur, Suchita)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17090751)Document filed by Carlos Hernandez Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. NTA, #2 Exhibit B. DHS Evidence, #3 Exhibit C. Hearing Notices, #4 Exhibit D. Motion to Advance, #5 Exhibit E. Bond Evidence, #6 Exhibit F. IJ Bond Denial, #7 Exhibit G. Notice of Bond Appeal, #8 Exhibit H. BIA Bond Appeal Receipt, #9 Exhibit I. IJ Bond Memorandum)(Mathur, Suchita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez Barrera v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Hernandez Barrera
Represented By: Suchita Deolalikar Mathur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?