Martinelli v. Robb Report Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Antonio Martinelli
Defendant: Robb Report Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05619
Filed: June 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 8/6/2019 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Order of Discontinuance, #2 Complaint) (jca)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made by September 5, 2019. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.l (2d Cir. 2004). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 6, 2019 is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/6/2019) (jca)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Antonio Martinelli. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robb Report Media, LLC.(Arato, Cynthia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent PMC for Robb Report Media, LLC. Document filed by Robb Report Media, LLC.(Arato, Cynthia)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Antonio Martinelli. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/15/2019) (gr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Cynthia S. Arato dated 7/2/2019 re: request that Defendant's time to respond to the complaint be extended from 7/10/2019 until 7/31/2019. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/15/2019) (gr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Capaccio on behalf of Robb Report Media, LLC. (Capaccio, Lauren)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Cynthia S. Arato dated July 2, 2019. Document filed by Robb Report Media, LLC.(Arato, Cynthia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia S. Arato on behalf of Robb Report Media, LLC. (Arato, Cynthia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robb Report Media, LLC. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robb Report Media, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antonio Martinelli. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robb Report Media, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17092564)Document filed by Antonio Martinelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinelli v. Robb Report Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Martinelli
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robb Report Media, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia S. Arato
Represented By: Lauren Capaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?