Uddin v. National Recovery Agency et al
Plaintiff: Reyad Uddin
Defendant: National Recovery Agency, Equifax Information Services LLC and NRA Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05625
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Klein, Jonathan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. NRA Group, LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service was accepted by Ary Melendez, Receptionist. Document filed by Reyad Uddin. (Tariq, Subhan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NRA Group, LLC. (pne)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NRA Group, LLC, re: #14 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Reyad Uddin. (Tariq, Subhan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #10 Amended Complaint, against Equifax Information Services LLC, NRA Group, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Reyad Uddin. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,.(Tariq, Subhan)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/23/2019) (cf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Subhan Tariq, Esq. dated 07/22/2019. Document filed by Reyad Uddin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Tariq, Subhan)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Subhan Tariq to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request could not be processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Subhan Tariq re: Document No. #10 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NRA Group, LLC, re: #10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Reyad Uddin. (Tariq, Subhan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, NRA Group, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Reyad Uddin.(Tariq, Subhan) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jgo).
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Subhan Tariq Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summonses requested can not be issued for Notice of Removals. (jgo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Recovery Agency, re: Complaint. Document filed by Reyad Uddin. (Tariq, Subhan) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jgo).
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Subhan Tariq on behalf of Reyad Uddin. (Tariq, Subhan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Klein, Jonathan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Brownstein, Boris)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/19/2019) (jca)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Klein, Jonathan)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Daniel Klein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Reyad Uddin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Daniel Klein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jonathan Daniel Klein to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. Document filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Klein, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Klein, Jonathan) Modified on 6/18/2019 (jgo).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court of the City of New York, County of Bronx, County of Bronx. Case Number: 09115. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17094684).Document filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal)(Klein, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uddin v. National Recovery Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Recovery Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRA Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyad Uddin
Represented By: Subhan Tariq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?