Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC v. Eminent Sportswear, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC
Defendant: DOES 1-10, BJ's Wholesale and Eminent Sportswear, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05632
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eminent Sportswear, Inc..(Fogel, Louis)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Jeffrey A. Kobulnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/18/2019) (jwh)
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: BJ's Wholesale answer due 7/31/2019; Eminent Sportswear, Inc. answer due 7/31/2019. (jwh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 12/16/2019. Required Disclosures - 8/7. Time to Move or Answer - 7/31. The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/24/2019. First request for production of documents, if any, must be served by 8/7. Interrogatories pursuant to Rule 33.3(a) of the Local Civil Rules of the Southern District of New York must be served by 8/7. Deposition due by 10/31/2019. Discovery due by 11/4/2019. Motions due by 11/22/2019. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 12/13/2019. Oral Argument set for 12/20/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/15/2019) (jwh)
July 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 AMENDED MOTION for Jeffrey A. Kobulnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED MOTION for Jeffrey A. Kobulnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kobulnick, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Louis I Fogel to RE-FILE Document #18 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by BJ's Wholesale.(Fogel, Louis) Modified on 7/17/2019 (ldi).
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Louis I Fogel to RE-FILE Document #16 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
July 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/15/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 13, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eminent Sportswear, Inc..(Fogel, Louis)
July 13, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by BJ's Wholesale.(Fogel, Louis) Modified on 7/16/2019 (ldi).
July 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Jeffrey A. Kobulnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17228237. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeffrey A. Kobulnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17228237. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/11/2019 (wb).
July 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/8/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis I Fogel on behalf of BJ's Wholesale, Eminent Sportswear, Inc.. (Fogel, Louis)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/26/2019) (jca)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. BJ's Wholesale served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service was accepted by Jason Vogt-Lowell, Employment Counsel. Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Feinland, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Eminent Sportswear, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service was accepted by Andrea Preciado, Sales. Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Feinland, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Phillip Feinland on behalf of Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Feinland, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eminent Sportswear, Inc.. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BJ's Wholesale. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Marc Purow. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC; Eminent Sportswear, Inc.; BJ's Wholesal; Does 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Marc Purow. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 17:101; Dollar Demand $500000000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 17:501; the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Purow, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC.(Purow, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BJ's Wholesale, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Purow, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eminent Sportswear, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Purow, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Purow, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BJ's Wholesale, DOES 1-10, Eminent Sportswear, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17096938)Document filed by Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Purow, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC v. Eminent Sportswear, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Wholesale
Represented By: Louis I Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eminent Sportswear, Inc.
Represented By: Louis I Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fashion Avenue Sweater Knits, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Purow
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kobulnick
Represented By: Robert Phillip Feinland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?