Kirkland v. New York City et al
Plaintiff: Brian Kirkland
Defendant: PO JANE DOE, New York City, PO John Doe 1-4, Police Officer Jane Doe and Police Officers John Doe 1-4
Case Number: 1:2019cv05634
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Teresa Ryan on behalf of New York City. (Ryan, Erin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. New York City served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. Service was accepted by Inez Contreras, clerk. Document filed by Brian Kirkland. (Anderson, Malcolm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Malcolm Alastair Anderson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Police Officer Jane Doe; Police Officer Jane Doe; Police Officers John Doe 1-4; Police Officers John Doe 1-4. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Malcolm Alastair Anderson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Duncan Archie Peterson on behalf of Brian Kirkland. (Peterson, Duncan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Anderson, Malcolm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Kirkland. (Anderson, Malcolm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANE DOE, Jane Doe, John Doe 1-4(in their capacity as member of the NYPD), John Doe 1-4(individually ), New York City. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17097806)Document filed by Brian Kirkland.(Anderson, Malcolm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkland v. New York City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City
Represented By: Erin Teresa Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO John Doe 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officers John Doe 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kirkland
Represented By: Malcolm Alastair Anderson
Represented By: Duncan Archie Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?