S. Katzman Produce, Inc. et al v. The Italian Scallion LLC et al
Plaintiff: S. Katzman Produce, Inc. and Katzman Berry Corp.
Defendant: Salvatore Orlando Sampieri and The Italian Scallion LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05637
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory Adam Brown on behalf of Katzman Berry Corp., S. Katzman Produce, Inc.. New Address: McCarron & Diess, 576 Broadhollow Road, Suite 105, Melville, New York, US 11747, (631) 425-8110. (Brown, Gregory)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs are qualified trust creditors and beneficiaries under the provisions of the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act, 7 U.S.C. 499a, et seq. ("PACA"), of Defendants, jointly and severally, for a debt in the aggregate principal amount of $16,899.00, plus accrued interest at the rate of 18% per annum through July 12, 2019 in the amount of $603.74 and reasonable attorneys' fees and legal expenses incurred by Plaintiffs in the amount of $1,620.00 for a total debt under PACA in the amount of $19,542.74 (the "PACA Trust Debt"). For full and final satisfaction of Plaintiffs' claims, subject to the terms and conditions of this Stipulation and Order, Defendants shall pay to Plaintiffs the full amount of the PACA Trust Debt in equal weekly installments of $1,500.00 each commencing on July 12, 2019 and continuing on each successive Friday until the PACA Trust Debt is paid in full. All payments to be made under this Stipulation and Order shall be paid so as to be received on or before 3:00PM on the date due, TIME BEING OF THE ESSENCE. Except as otherwise expressly set forth herein, all payments shall be made by bank check, money order or wire transfer and shall be paid so as to be received by Katzman on or before the date and time payment is due. All payments shall be made payable to "S. Katzman Produce, Inc." and delivered to Plaintiffs at 153-157 New York City Terminal Market, Bronx, New York 10474, and as further set forth in this Stipulation and Order. This case shall be administratively closed, but may be reopened to enforce the terms and conditions of the Stipulation and Order without further costs or fees. This Stipulation and Order constitutes the entire understanding of the Parties and may not be changed unless in a written agreement signed by all parties or their representatives. IT IS SO AGREED AND APPROVED AS TO FORM AND CONTENT. So ordered. Salvatore Orlando Sampieri and The Italian Scallion LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/17/2019) (rjm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Katzman Berry Corp., S. Katzman Produce, Inc.. (Brown, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Salvatore Orlando Sampieri served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service was accepted by Salvatore Orlando Sampieri, personally. Document filed by S. Katzman Produce, Inc.; Katzman Berry Corp.. (Brown, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Italian Scallion LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service was accepted by Salvatore Orlando Sampieri, Authorized Agent. Document filed by S. Katzman Produce, Inc.; Katzman Berry Corp.. (Brown, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Salvatore Orlando Sampieri. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Italian Scallion LLC. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Adam Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $20,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $21,000;. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Salvatore Orlando Sampieri, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Katzman Berry Corp., S. Katzman Produce, Inc.. (Brown, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Italian Scallion LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Katzman Berry Corp., S. Katzman Produce, Inc.. (Brown, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brown, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Katzman Berry Corp., S. Katzman Produce, Inc..(Brown, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Salvatore Orlando Sampieri, The Italian Scallion LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17098600)Document filed by S. Katzman Produce, Inc., Katzman Berry Corp..(Brown, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. Katzman Produce, Inc. et al v. The Italian Scallion LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Katzman Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katzman Berry Corp.
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Orlando Sampieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Italian Scallion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?