Webster et al v. City Of New York
Plaintiff: Gregory Webster and LISA WEBSTER
Defendant: The City Of New York, and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv05638
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond is hereby extended until August 16, 2019. (City Of New York answer due 8/16/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/6/2019) (jwh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Erik Zissu dated 08/06/19. Document filed by City Of New York.(Zissu, Erik)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik March Zissu on behalf of City Of New York. (Zissu, Erik)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/22/2019) (rro)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. City Of New York served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mezyck - Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Gregory Webster; Lisa Webster. (Fraser, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher Scott Fraser. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Scott Fraser. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LISA WEBSTER, Gregory Webster, The City Of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by LISA WEBSTER, Gregory Webster. (Fraser, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraser, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17098717)Document filed by Gregory Webster, LISA WEBSTER.(Fraser, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster et al v. City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Webster
Represented By: Christopher Scott Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA WEBSTER
Represented By: Christopher Scott Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Erik March Zissu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?