Velasquez v. New Red Star Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velasquez
Defendant: New Red Star Inc. and 112-116 Realty Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05643
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 7, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New Red Star Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
July 7, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 112-116 Realty Corp. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Red Star Inc.. (sj)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 112-116 Realty Corp.. (sj)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against 112-116 Realty Corp., New Red Star Inc.. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Jonas Mirel on behalf of Ricardo Velasquez. (Mirel, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 112-116 REALTY CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW RED STAR INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Ricardo Velasquez. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17100402)Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez.(Weitz, Ben-Zion) Modified on 6/18/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. New Red Star Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velasquez
Represented By: Robert Jonas Mirel
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Red Star Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 112-116 Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?