Fischler v. Gotham Hall, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Fischler
Defendant: Gotham Hall, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05644
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gotham Hall, LLC waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. Document filed by Brian Fischler. (Lipsky, Douglas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda M. Fugazy on behalf of Gotham Hall, LLC. (Fugazy, Amanda)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilan Weiser on behalf of Gotham Hall, LLC. (Weiser, Ilan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/22/2019) (rro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gotham Hall, LLC. (sj)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lowe, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gotham Hall, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Fischler. (Lowe, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gotham Hall, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17100538)Document filed by Brian Fischler.(Lowe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischler v. Gotham Hall, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fischler
Represented By: Christopher Howard Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotham Hall, LLC
Represented By: Ilan Weiser
Represented By: Amanda M. Fugazy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?