Kirschgessner v. Portage World-Wide, Inc.
Plaintiff: Markus Kirschgessner
Defendant: Portage World-Wide, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05647
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Markus Kirschgessner. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Portage World-Wide, Inc.. (Ferrari, Lisa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Portage World-Wide, Inc..(Ferrari, Lisa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Ann Ferrari on behalf of Portage World-Wide, Inc.. (Ferrari, Lisa)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/19/2019) (jca)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Portage World-Wide, Inc.. (dnh)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Portage World-Wide, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Markus Kirschgessner. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portage World-Wide, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17100640)Document filed by Markus Kirschgessner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirschgessner v. Portage World-Wide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Kirschgessner
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portage World-Wide, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Ann Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?