Brown v. USA Truck, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy J Brown and Dorothy Brown
Defendant: USA Truck, Inc. and Richard Halloway
Case Number: 1:2019cv05652
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332tm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:19-cv-00081, filed on 07/17/2018. (sjo)
July 10, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Georgia (cf)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, venue is not proper in the Southern District of New York under 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(1) because not all Defendants are residents of the State of New York. Because Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate that venue is proper in the Southern District of New York, the Clerk of Court is directed to (1) terminate the motion at ECF No. 5, and (2) transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia where venue is proper pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2). See ECF No. 4. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/10/2019) (cf) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to Show Cause,, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ronald S. Ramo dated July 2, 2019. Document filed by Dorothy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Opp to OTSC)(Ramo, Ronald)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Based on a review of the complaint, it appears that the action should have been brought in the Northern District of Georgia because "a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred there." Id. (b)(2). See also Compl. paragraph 17 (accident occurred in Carroll). The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing, by July 1, 2019, whether this action should be transferred. If Plaintiff fails to respond the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/19/2019) (rjm)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ronald Salvatore Ramo to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald Salvatore Ramo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dorothy Brown. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ronald Salvatore Ramo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1000000000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ronald Salvatore Ramo to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption; Jury Demand code - no selection; Citizenship Defendant code - multiple selections;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to USA Truck, Inc., Richard Halloway, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dorothy J Brown. (Ramo, Ronald) Modified on 6/19/2019 (jgo).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ramo, Ronald) Modified on 6/19/2019 (jgo).
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Halloway, USA Truck, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17101714)Document filed by Dorothy J Brown.(Ramo, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. USA Truck, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy J Brown
Represented By: Ronald Salvatore Ramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Brown
Represented By: Ronald Salvatore Ramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Truck, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Halloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?