Vilhena v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Marcos Andre de Almeida Vilhena
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05671
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:632
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Marcos Andre de Almeida Vilhena. (Curtis, Christian)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Victor Marrero for an initial case management conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Friday, September 6, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 15B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/16/2019) (js)
July 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim. Document filed by Marcos Andre de Almeida Vilhena.(Curtis, Christian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Curtis on behalf of Marcos Andre de Almeida Vilhena. (Curtis, Christian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Marcos Andre de Almeida Vilhena. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A..(McPhee, Sean)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of of filing and service of notice of removal with state court re: #8 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (McPhee, Sean)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653088/2019..Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court docket sheet), #2 Exhibit B (plaintiff's complaint), #3 Exhibit C (redacted letter with enclosures))(McPhee, Sean)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Sean Charles McPhee to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment to the pleading must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
June 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Revised Notice of Removal (solely to redact account numbers in Exhibit C to original Notice of Removal (i.e. Doc. No. 1-3)) re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McPhee, Sean)
June 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Sean Charles McPhee to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and supporting Exhibits served on Marcos Andre de Almeida Vilhena on 06/18/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (McPhee, Sean)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A..(McPhee, Sean) Modified on 6/19/2019 (ldi).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Charles McPhee on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (McPhee, Sean)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McPhee, Sean)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653088/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17103599).Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McPhee, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vilhena v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Sean Charles McPhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Andre de Almeida Vilhena
Represented By: Christian Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?