Williams v. United States of America
Plaintiff: John T. Williams
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv05692
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Richard J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Order of Dismissal, Terminate Motions, to John T. Williams 437 Kendrick Est Dr Jonesboro, GA 30238. (aea)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: On June 27, 2019, the Court received the attached letter from Plaintiff, advising that he wishes to withdraw his motion for return of property. Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff's request to withdraw this action pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and to note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) for the limited purpose of dismissing this complaint without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: #1 MOTION FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY pursuant to Rule 41(e). [ Re: Criminal Case 1:14-cr-00784-RJS-2 ]. filed by John T. Williams. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/1/2019) (rj) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Williams, dated 6/23/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he does not want to open a new civil case at this time; and he would like the Pro Se Office to cancel the new complaint requested by the Courts etc. Document filed by John T. Williams.(sc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to open the motion for return of property as a new civil action, and docket the motion (ECF No. 13) and this order in the new case. The Court will issue a follow-up order directing Plaintiff to either pay the filing fee or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court shall docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/14/2019) (sac)
June 14, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-cr-00784-RJS. (sac)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
June 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY pursuant to Rule 41(e). [ Re: Criminal Case 1:14-cr-00784-RJS-2 ]. Document filed by John T. Williams. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?