James v. Levi et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence N. James
Defendant: Peter Zsolt Levi, Cowan Systems, LLC and Cowan Equipment Leasing
Case Number: 1:2019cv05712
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 8/2/2019) (cf)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/01/2019) (ama)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Peter Getzoni on behalf of Lawrence N. James. (Getzoni, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Cowan Equipment Leasing, Cowan Systems, LLC, Peter Zsolt Levi(Zimmerman, Kevin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cowan Equipment Leasing, Cowan Systems, LLC, Peter Zsolt Levi.(Zimmerman, Kevin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zimmerman, Kevin)
June 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kevin Michael Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cowan Equipment Leasing, Cowan Systems, LLC, Peter Zsolt Levi.(Zimmerman, Kevin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zimmerman, Kevin) Modified on 6/20/2019 (jgo).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court New York, County of New York County. Case Number: 153319/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17107734).Document filed by Cowan Equipment Leasing, Cowan Systems, LLC, Peter Zsolt Levi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Zimmerman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Levi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Zsolt Levi
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowan Systems, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowan Equipment Leasing
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence N. James
Represented By: Mark Peter Getzoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?