Arenas et al v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Kirkland, Dr. Lance Tyler Albin, Cindy Candy Arenas, Jaky Alyssa Arenas, Donald Kirkland, Cassandra Adams, Connor Brown, Dr. Alexis Victoria Albin, Joe Leos Arenas, Elhadji Cisse and Jiny Alexa Arenas
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co., Safran USA, Inc., CFM International, Inc., The Boeing Company, GE Aviation Systems, LLC and Boeing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05761
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for James Denny Shupe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #34 MOTION for James Denny Shupe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17644793.(Shupe, James)
September 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #34 MOTION for James Denny Shupe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for James Denny Shupe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J.Denny Shupe, #2 Exhibit Exhibit-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shupe, James)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Stephen J Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Stephen J Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17638148. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Stephen J Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17638148. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen J Shapiro, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Pennsylvania, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - New Jersey)(Shapiro, Stephen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Barry S. Alexander dated September 3, 2019 re: Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Southwest Airlines Company's Contemplated Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, to Stay this Action Pending Conclusion of the NTSB Investigations. Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co..(Alexander, Barry)
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Barry Steven Alexander to RE-FILE Document #23 MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel Regarding Southwest Airlines Company's Contemplated Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, to Stay this Action Pending Conclusion of the NTSB Inv. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ldi)
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:15 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (jwh)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #29 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #27 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: The Court has in hand three letters from Mr. Johnson, counsel for the plaintiffs in this action. Each of the letters are responsive to one or more defendant's pre-motion letters and each seeks leave to amend. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint provided they do so by September 27, 2019. Also by September 27, 2019 counsel for the removing defendants shall submit letter briefs explaining the basis for removal and their assertion of subject matter jurisdiction as of the date of removal. The response should include discussion whether, under New York choice of law principles, Joe Arenas's loss of consortium claim ought to be governed by the place where Joe Arena and Cindy Arena were domiciled, i.e. Texas, and whether, under Texas law, the claim was extinguished by the release of the claims of Cindy Arenas. Plaintiffs may respond within seven days of defendants' submission. The initial conference in this case is adjourned from September 27 to November 6, 2019 at 11:15 a.m. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/10/2019) (jwh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply Letter to Southwest Airlines Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan W. Johnson dated 9/9/2019. Document filed by Dr. Alexis Victoria Albin, Dr. Lance Tyler Albin.(Johnson, Jonathan) Modified on 9/19/2019 (ldi).
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply Letter to CFM International, GE Aviation and Safran USA addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan W. Johnson dated 9/9/2019. Document filed by Dr. Alexis Victoria Albin, Dr. Lance Tyler Albin.(Johnson, Jonathan) Modified on 9/19/2019 (ldi).
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply Letter to Boeing Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan W. Johnson dated 9/9/2019. Document filed by Dr. Alexis Victoria Albin, Dr. Lance Tyler Albin.(Johnson, Jonathan) Modified on 9/19/2019 (ldi).
September 4, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Pre-Motion Letter (ECF No. 23) served on Plaintiffs on September 4, 2019. Service was made by Overnight Mail and Electronic Mail. Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Alexander, Barry)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [ECF No. 21] served on Attorney for Plaintiffs on 09/04/2019. Service was made by First Class Mail. Document filed by Boeing Company. (Baum, Edwin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Engine Manufacturers' Pre-Motion Letter re Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 22] served on Plaintiffs on September 3, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc.. (Worthington, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel Regarding Southwest Airlines Company's Contemplated Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, to Stay this Action Pending Conclusion of the NTSB Investigations. Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co..(Alexander, Barry) Modified on 9/19/2019 (ldi).
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from James Worthington dated September 3, 2019 re: pre-motion letter setting forth bases for joint motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc..(Worthington, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Edwin M. Baum dated September 3, 2019. Document filed by Boeing Company.(Baum, Edwin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Joint Letter Re: Dismissal of Plaintiff Joe Arenas [ECF No. 19] served on Plaintiffs on August 9, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc.. (Worthington, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from James B. Worthington dated August 9, 2019 re: Dismissal of Plaintiff Joe Arenas. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc..(Worthington, James)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge P. Kevin Castel for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Less Than All Parties (ECF. No. 17) served on Plaintiffs on August 8, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc.. (Worthington, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Cassandra Adams, Cindy Candy Arenas, Jaky Alyssa Arenas, Jiny Alexa Arenas, Joe Leos Arenas, Connor Brown, Elhadji Cisse, Beverly Kirkland, Donald Kirkland and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Worthington, James)
July 16, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 11:45 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (ks)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. On a one-time basis I will grant the requested extension and approve the parties' proposed schedule. There will be an initial conference on September 27, 2019 at 11:45 am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/15/2019) Motions due by 8/16/2019. (ks)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of All Current Deadlines by 28 Days addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from All Parties dated July 12, 2019. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc..(Worthington, James)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Edwin M. Baum dated June 25, 2019. Document filed by Boeing Company. Application granted to the extent that the time for all defendants to respond is extended to August 5, 2019. So ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/26/2019) (rjm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Steven Alexander on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co.. (Alexander, Barry)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Primecap Management Company for Southwest Airlines Co.. Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co..(Alexander, Barry)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Edwin M. Baum dated June 25, 2019. Document filed by Boeing Company.(Baum, Edwin)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: No later than July 15, 2019, defendants shall demonstrate in writing why the citizenship of Joe Arenas should be disregarded for the purpose of exercising diversity jurisdiction. Arenas may respond by July 29, 2019. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/24/2019) (jwh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Joint Notice of Removal served on Jonathan Wesley Johnson, Jacqueline M. James, Barry S. Alexander and Edwin M. Baum on June 20, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc.. (Worthington, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boeing Company.(Baum, Edwin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edwin Mark Baum on behalf of Boeing Company. (Baum, Edwin)
June 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James B Worthington. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CFM International, Inc. ; The Boeing Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co..(Alexander, Barry)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Safran SA for Safran USA, Inc.. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc..(Worthington, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate GE Aviation Systems North America LLC, Other Affiliate GE UK Industrial Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate General Electric International, Inc. for GE Aviation Systems, LLC. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc..(Worthington, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent Safran Aircraft Engines for CFM International, Inc.. Document filed by CFM International, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, Safran USA, Inc..(Worthington, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Worthington, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155786/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17112724).Document filed by Southwest Airlines Co., Safran USA, Inc., GE Aviation Systems, LLC, CFM International, Inc., The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Worthington, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arenas et al v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Lance Tyler Albin
Represented By: Jonathan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Candy Arenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaky Alyssa Arenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Alexis Victoria Albin
Represented By: Jonathan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Leos Arenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elhadji Cisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiny Alexa Arenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Barry Steven Alexander
Represented By: James Denny Shupe
Represented By: Stephen J. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safran USA, Inc.
Represented By: James B Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFM International, Inc.
Represented By: James B Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Aviation Systems, LLC
Represented By: James B Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Edwin Mark Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?