MICCA et al v. AliMed, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DAVID J. MICCA and BETH A. MICCA
Defendant: Whittacker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Johnson & Johnson Products, Inc., Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc., Cosmetic Specialties LLC, Estee Lauder, Inc., IMI Fabi (Diana) LLC, Gill Podiatry Supply & Equipment Co., Revlon, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Radebaugh Fetzer Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., BSN medical Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Shiseido America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Orthopaedics, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Chanel, Inc., Medline Industries, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Private Label Cosmetics Corporation, R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc., AliMed, Inc. and Brenntag North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05788
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel of record for all parties who have appeared in the above-captioned action, that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii), the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed as to all claims known or knowable to the Plaintiffs, with prejudice and without costs to any party, as to the following Defendants: CHANEL, INC. CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO. JOHNSON & JOHNSON JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. JOHNSON & JOHNSON ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. JOHNSON & JOHNSON PRODUCTS, INC. MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC. REVLON, INC. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel of record for all parties who have appeared in the above-captioned action, that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(c)(1), all cross-claims asserted by defendants CHANEL, INC.; CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO.; and REVLON, INC. against any defendant that is being dismissed with prejudice pursuant to this stipulation, also are hereby dismissed, with prejudice and without costs to any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/13/2019) (jca)
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Chanel, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Medline Industries, Inc., Revlon, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Beth A. Micca, David J. Micca. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Wasserberg, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between all parties who have appeared in the above-captioned action, and/or their respective counsels, that Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the above captioned-action is voluntarily dismissed as to all claims known or knowable to the Plaintiffs, without prejudice; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/8/2019) (jca)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between all parties who have appeared in the above-captioned action, and/or their respective counsels, that Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the above captioned-action is voluntarily dismissed as to all claims known or knowable to the Plaintiffs, without prejudice, against defendants: ALIMED, INC.; BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., Individually and as Successor in Interest to MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC., as Successor in Interest to WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS; BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC. f/k/a MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. and as successor in interest to WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC.; BSN MEDICAL, INC.; COSMETIC SPECIALTIES LLC; ESTEE LAUDER, INC.; GILL PODIATRY SUPPLY & EQUIPMENT CO.; IMIFABI (DIANA) LLC; MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL INC., Individually and as Successor in Interest to MOORE MEDICAL, INC.; MINERAL AND PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC., f/k/a WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC.; PRIVATE LABEL COSMETICS CORPORATION; R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC., Individually and as Successor in Interest to INTERNATIONAL TALC CO., INTERNATIONAL PULP CO., and GOVERNEUR TALC CO., INC.; RADEBAUGH FETZER COMPANY, Individually and as Successor in Interest to GILL PODIATRY; SHISEIDO AMERICA, INC., Individually and as Successor in Interest to BARE ESCENTUALS, INC. a/k/a BARE MINERALS; THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.; and WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC., Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) with each party bearing their own fees and costs incurred in this matter; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between all parties who have appeared in the above-captioned action, and/or their respective counsels, that all cross-claims asserted by defendants CHANEL, INC.; CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO. and REVLON, INC. are hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(c)(l). SO ORDERED. Brenntag North America, Inc. (Individually and as Successor in Interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., as Successor in Interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels), Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Chanel, Inc., Cosmetic Specialties LLC, Estee Lauder, Inc., Gill Podiatry Supply & Equipment Co., IMI Fabi (Diana) LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. (Individually and as Successor in Interest to Moore Medical, Inc.), Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc., Private Label Cosmetics Corporation, R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. (Individually and as Successor in Interest to International Talc Co., International Pulp Co., and Governeur Talc Co., Inc.), Radebaugh Fetzer Company (Individually and as Successor in Interest to Gill Podiatry), Revlon, Inc., Shiseido America, Inc. (Individually and as Successor in Interest to Bare Escentuals, Inc. a/k/a Bare Minerals), The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Whittacker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., AliMed, Inc. and BSN medical Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/8/2019) (jca)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #26 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lorna G. Schofield for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) L'Oreal USA, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Beth A. Micca, David J. Micca. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Wasserberg, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #25 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lorna G. Schofield for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) AliMed, Inc., BSN medical Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cosmetic Specialties LLC, Estee Lauder, Inc., Gill Podiatry Supply & Equipment Co., IMI Fabi (Diana) LLC, L'Oreal USA, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc., Private Label Cosmetics Corporation, R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc., Radebaugh Fetzer Company, Shiseido America, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Whittacker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Beth A. Micca, David J. Micca. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Wasserberg, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Daniel Wasserberg to RE-FILE Document #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type Other Filings, Other Documents, Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. (km)
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) AliMed, Inc., BSN medical Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cosmetic Specialties LLC, Estee Lauder, Inc., Gill Podiatry Supply & Equipment Co., IMI Fabi (Diana) LLC, L'Oreal USA, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc., Private Label Cosmetics Corporation, R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc., Radebaugh Fetzer Company, Shiseido America, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Whittacker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Document filed by Beth A. Micca, David J. Micca. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. (Wasserberg, Daniel) Modified on 8/7/2019 (km).
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(L'Homme, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Joshua Wasserberg on behalf of Beth A. Micca, David J. Micca. (Wasserberg, Daniel)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert L'Homme on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (L'Homme, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert L'Homme on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(L'Homme, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Freeport Minerals Corporation f/k/a Phelps Dodge Corporation, Corporate Parent Freeport McMoRan Inc. for Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. Document filed by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(L'Homme, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jaime L Regan on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc.. (Regan, Jaime)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederick Harold Fern on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc.. (Fern, Frederick)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Rizvi, Syed)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against AliMed, Inc., BSN medical Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cosmetic Specialties LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Estee Lauder, Inc., Gill Podiatry Supply & Equipment Co., IMI Fabi (Diana) LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Medline Industries, Inc., Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc., Private Label Cosmetics Corporation, R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc., Radebaugh Fetzer Company, Revlon, Inc., Shiseido America, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Whittacker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Rizvi, Syed)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Ethan Funk on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Funk, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Scheduling Order served on All Counsel of record on July 17, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/15/2019) (kgo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Revlon, Inc..(McCann, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Revlon, Inc. for Revlon, Inc.. Document filed by Revlon, Inc..(McCann, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy M. McCann on behalf of Revlon, Inc.. (McCann, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Kurland, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Kurland, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Thomas Philip Kurland to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): PDF error. NOTE: The PDFs are labeled "Notice of Removal," please label them correctly and re-file. (ldi)
June 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Philip Kurland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BETH A. MICCA, DAVID J. MICCA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and supporting documents served on Attorneys for Plaintiffs and Other Defendants on 6/20/2019. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Kurland, Thomas) Modified on 6/21/2019 (ldi).
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Kurland, Thomas) Modified on 6/21/2019 (ldi).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kurland, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190145/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17117420).Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Document List, and Summons and Compaint)(Kurland, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICCA et al v. AliMed, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittacker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmetic Specialties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estee Lauder, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMI Fabi (Diana) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Podiatry Supply & Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radebaugh Fetzer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: Matthew Ethan Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSN medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiseido America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Michael Robert L'Homme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Syed Kazim Rizvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medline Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime L Regan
Represented By: Frederick Harold Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: Matthew Ethan Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Label Cosmetics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AliMed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J. MICCA
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Wasserberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH A. MICCA
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Wasserberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?