Brown v. Amchem Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diana Brown and Frederick G. Brown
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., General Electric Company, Ford Motor Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Amchem Products, Inc., American Biltrite, Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Karnak Corporation, Goodyear Canada, Inc., Georgia Pacific LLC., Pfizer, Inc. (Pfizer), Certainteed Corporation, Dap, Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Blackmer, Bird Incorporated, BWIP, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Eaton Corporation, U.S. Rubber Company (Uniroyal), CBS Corporation and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05844
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court on August 19, 2019. Document filed by Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown. (Weinstein, Jason)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown. (Weinstein, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affirmation of Service for Cleaver-Brooks' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court served on All Parties on 8/12/19. Document filed by Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc.. (Halbardier, Suzanne)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatory Responses)(Halbardier, Suzanne)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter filed by Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #15 Letter, #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Responses due by 8/12/2019) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/11/2019) (rro)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Christina Anderson dated 08/05/2019 re: Extension for Filing Opposition. Document filed by Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Remand to State Court on July 22, 2019. Document filed by Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown. (Weinstein, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jason P. Weinstein dated July 22, 2019. Document filed by Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown.(Weinstein, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- Excerpts from W&L NYCAL Standard Complaint for Personal Injury, #3 Exhibit C -- Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D -- Deposition of Frederick Brown, #5 Exhibit E -- Plaintiffs' Product ID Interrogatories and Document Requests, #6 Exhibit F -- Excerpts of Assenzio Trial Transcript, #7 Exhibit G -- Email from Counsel for Foster Wheeler)(Weinstein, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown.(Weinstein, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jason P. Weinstein dated July 22, 2019 re: Filing of Motion to Remand Prior to the Completion of All Briefing. Document filed by Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown.(Weinstein, Jason)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC. Document filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Goodearl, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Goodearl, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patti Lynn Burshtyn on behalf of Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown. (Burshtyn, Patti)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Peter Weinstein on behalf of Diana Brown, Frederick G. Brown. (Weinstein, Jason)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/1/2019) (rj)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 25, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,.(Halbardier, Suzanne)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Halbardier, Suzanne)
June 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BWIP, Inc.; CBS Corporation; Eaton Corporation; Gardner Denver, Inc.; Goulds Pumps LLC; Honeywell International, Inc.; Pfizer, Inc. (Pfizer); Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company; Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
June 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier re: Document No. #2 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Diana Brown;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
June 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: CBS Corporation. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jgo).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 190195/2017..Document filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Cleaver-Brooks' Answer, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition Transcripts, #6 Exhibit Unopposed Summary Judgment Motion and Order, #7 Exhibit E-Mail Correspondence, #8 Exhibit McCaffery Affidavit, #9 Exhibit Sargent Affidavit, #10 Exhibit Foreman Affidavit, #11 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #12 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Notice of Removal)(Halbardier, Suzanne)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Every party involved in the case must be included in the caption title. Et al. cannot be used. Add Diana Brown to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/1/2019. (pc)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Amchem Products, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc) Modified on 6/24/2019 (pc).
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 190195/2017. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17123428). Document filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Cleaver-Brooks' Answer, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit Unopposed Summary Judgment Motion, #7 Exhibit E-Mail Correspondence, #8 Exhibit McCaffery Affidavit, #9 Exhibit Sargent Affidavit, #10 Exhibit Foreman Affidavit, #11 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #12 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Notice of Removal)(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 6/24/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Amchem Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne M. Halbardier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Biltrite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karnak Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Canada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc. (Pfizer)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWIP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Rubber Company (Uniroyal)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Brown
Represented By: Patti Lynn Burshtyn
Represented By: Jason Peter Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick G. Brown
Represented By: Patti Lynn Burshtyn
Represented By: Jason Peter Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?