Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv05855
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting #6 Motion for Discovery: THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (the "Motion"), and the Court being duly advised in the premises does hereby: FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE: Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/8/2019) (jwh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(James, Jacqueline)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
June 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/25/2019) (jwh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17124449)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?