Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv05867
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Discovery. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena, (Doc. 6), is hereby GRANTED, subject to the procedure set forth below to provide the Internet subscriber with a fair opportunity to contest the subpoena before his identity is disclosed to Plaintiff. Plaintiff may immediately serve a third-party subpoena upon Defendant's ISP, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45, requiring the ISP to disclose the name and address associated with IP address 96.246.51.137. The subpoena shall have a copy of this Order attached. The ISP shall have fifteen (15) days from the date the subpoena is served upon it to serve the affected Internet subscriber with a copy of the subpoena and a copy of this Order. The ISP may use any reasonable means to do so, including but not limited to written notice to the subscriber's last known address. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/22/2019) (ne)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(James, Jacqueline)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17124900)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?