Kreutter v. Teladoc Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chantelle Kreutter
Defendant: Brian McAndrews, James Outland, David B. Snow, Jr., Martin R. Felsenthal, Arneek Multani, Mark Hirschhorn, William H. Frist, Thomas G. McKinley, Helen Darling, Jason Gorevic, Kenneth H. Paulus, Michael Goldstein, Thomas Mawhinney and David Shedlarz
Nominal Defendant: Teladoc Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05875
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: September 12, 2019. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: September 19, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/01/2019) (ama)
July 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 12, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-11603-GHW. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Helen Darling, Martin R. Felsenthal, William H. Frist, Michael Goldstein, Jason Gorevic, Mark Hirschhorn, Thomas Mawhinney, Brian McAndrews, Thomas G. McKinley, Arneek Multani, James Outland, Kenneth H. Paulus, David Shedlarz, David B. Snow, Jr., Teladoc Health, Inc.. (pne)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Gorevic, Mark Hirschhorn, Helen Darling, Martin R. Felsenthal, William H. Frist, Michael Goldstein, Thomas Mawhinney, Thomas G. McKinley, Brian McAndrews, Arneek Multani, James Outland, Kenneth H. Paulus, David Shedlarz, David B. Snow, Jr., Teladoc Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Timothy Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct, missing the Court Name. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
June 24, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 1:18-cv-11603. (gp)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (gp)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy William Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Chantelle Kreutter. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (gp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William H. Frist, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Mawhinney, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas G. McKinley, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teladoc Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Goldstein, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martin R. Felsenthal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Hirschhorn, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Gorevic, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth H. Paulus, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Outland, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Helen Darling, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Snow, Jr., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Shedlarz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian McAndrews, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arneek Multani, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter. (Brown, Timothy) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gp).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brown, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-11603. Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter.(Brown, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Helen Darling, Martin R. Felsenthal, William H. Frist, Michael Goldstein, Jason Gorevic, Mark Hirschhorn, Thomas Mawhinney, Brian McAndrews, Thomas G. McKinley, Arneek Multani, James Outland, Kenneth H. Paulus, David Shedlarz, David B. Snow, Jr., Teladoc Health, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17125177)Document filed by Chantelle Kreutter.(Brown, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreutter v. Teladoc Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McAndrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Outland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Snow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin R. Felsenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arneek Multani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Frist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas G. McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Gorevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth H. Paulus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mawhinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shedlarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Teladoc Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantelle Kreutter
Represented By: Timothy William Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?