JetBlue Airways Corporation v. Jet.com Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Jet.com Inc. and Walmart Apollo, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05879
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Edward H. Rosenthal dated July 16, 2019. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. to respond to the complaint. So ordered. Jet.com Inc. answer due 8/26/2019; Walmart Apollo, LLC answer due 8/26/2019; Walmart Inc. answer due 8/26/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/16/2019) (rjm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Edward H. Rosenthal dated July 16, 2019. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Rosenthal, Edward)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jet.com Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by John Doe, Facilities Coordinator. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Walmart Apollo, LLC served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service was accepted by Karen Price, Intake Specialist at C T Corp. System (Registered Agent). Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Walmart Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service was accepted by Karen Price, Intake Specialist at C T Corp. System (Registered Agent). Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are informed that Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP, the law firm where my husband was previously a partner and is now Senior Counsel, represents the Audit Committee of Walmart but does not represent Walmart and has never done so. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/8/2019) (jwh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Edward Henry Rosenthal to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Apollo, LLC. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Inc.. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jet.com Inc.. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Henry Rosenthal. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lily Nicole Roos on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Roos, Lily)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly M. Maynard on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Maynard, Kimberly)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walmart Apollo, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walmart Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jet.com Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jet.com Inc., Walmart Apollo, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17125442)Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Rosenthal, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JetBlue Airways Corporation v. Jet.com Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Apollo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Kimberly M. Maynard
Represented By: Lily Nicole Roos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?