Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Haymarket Media, Inc.

Plaintiff: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Haymarket Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05880
Filed: June 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 8/9/2019 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jwh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the parties hereby stipulate to dismiss this action with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/9/2019) (jwh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Haymarket Media, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Isaac Rabicoff. RE-FILE Document No. #16 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The stipulation needs to have handwritten signatures of the attorneys. (km)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Haymarket Media, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 8/9/2019 (km).
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 1/8/2020. Motion to Dismiss: Moving - 8/9; Answering Papers - 8/23; Reply - 8/30. Oral Argument set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. This case is to be tried to a jury. Joinder of Parties due by 9/6/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2019. Deposition due by 11/8/2019. Discovery due by 11/8/2019. Motions due by 11/15/2019. Responses due by 12/13/2019 Replies due by 12/23/2019. Oral Argument set for 1/3/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/8/2019) (jwh)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/8/2019) (jwh)
August 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/8/2019, ( Motions due by 8/9/2019., Replies due by 8/30/2019., Responses due by 8/23/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff., Oral Argument set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Haymarket Media, Inc.. (Sekel, Anne)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Haymarket Media, Inc.. (Sekel, Anne)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Berkowitz Sekel on behalf of Haymarket Media, Inc.. (Sekel, Anne)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Netram Loaknauth on behalf of Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Initial Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
July 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/22/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/16/2019) (jwh)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff, Patent Judge. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 25, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Haymarket Media, Inc.. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Isaac Rabicoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
June 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17125584. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17125584. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl of Rabicoff, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Haymarket Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 22, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 22, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Haymarket Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17125575)Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Haymarket Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haymarket Media, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Berkowitz Sekel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Represented By: Nicholas Netram Loaknauth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?