Brown v. Richer-Guinard et al

Plaintiff: SHANA L. BROWN
Defendant: Mr. SAMUEL RICHER-GUINARD, GEICO- Government Employees Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company and Samuel Richer-Guinard
Case Number: 1:2019cv05914
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441au
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/5/2019) (kv)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Frank Tiscione dated August 2, 2019. Document filed by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Tiscione, Frank)
August 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 FIRST MOTION to Remand: Responses due by 9/5/2019 (jwh)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/30/2019) (jwh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion to remand this matter back to state court addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Kathleen M. Murphy dated July 29, 2019. Document filed by Samuel Richer-Guinard.(Murphy, Kathleen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION to Remand . Document filed by Shana L. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Ex A, #3 Exhibit Ex B, #4 Exhibit Ex C, #5 Exhibit Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F, #8 Ex G, #9 Ex H, #10 Ex I, #11 Affidavit Aff service)(Ogen, Eitan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Kathleen Marie Murphy on behalf of Samuel Richer-Guinard. Re: #3 Notice of Appearance. (Murphy, Kathleen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Marie Murphy on behalf of Samuel Richer-Guinard. (Murphy, Kathleen)
June 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew George Miller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100,000,000; County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $100,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
June 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Matthew George Miller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shana L. Brown; Samuel Richer-Guinard; Government Employees Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Miller, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 27361/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17131608).Document filed by SAMUEL RICHER-GUINARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Affidavit)(Miller, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Richer-Guinard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. SAMUEL RICHER-GUINARD
Represented By: Matthew George Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO- Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Frank Peter Tiscione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Richer-Guinard
Represented By: Matthew George Miller
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANA L. BROWN
Represented By: Eitan Alexander Ogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?