Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv05952
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Stephanie Smith. (Osborn, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Stephanie Smith. (Osborn, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Stephanie Smith. (Osborn, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (gp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (gp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (gp)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall file his or her motion for judgment on the pleadings no later than 30 days after the parties' joint letter is due. The Commissioner shall file her response to the motion for judgment on the pleadings no later than 60 days after plaintiff's motion is due. No later than 21 days after the Commissioner's response is due, plaintiff shall file any reply.(As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 6/27/2019) (cf)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/26/2019) (rro)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/26/2019) (rro)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pne)
June 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY c/o US ATTORNEY GENERAL, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephanie Smith. (Osborn, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY c/o OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL, REGION II, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephanie Smith. (Osborn, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Attorney, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephanie Smith. (Osborn, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Stephanie Smith.(Osborn, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Osborn, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Stephanie Smith.(Osborn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Daniel Adam Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?