Umbra LLC v. Oxo International, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Umbra LLC
Defendant: OXO INTERNATIONAL, LTD and Oxo International, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05955
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Colin B. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Daniel L. Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Umbra LLC. Document filed by Oxo International, Ltd..(Moffett, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Colin B. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Colin B. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Oxo International, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Phillips, Colin)
August 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Colin B. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17410981. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas. We do not except them from a state bar association.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Colin B. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17410981. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Oxo International, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Phillips, Colin) Modified on 8/12/2019 (bcu).
July 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Daniel L. Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312643. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael P. Kahn on behalf of Oxo International, Ltd.. (Kahn, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Helen of Troy Limited (Bermuda) for Oxo International, Ltd.. Document filed by Oxo International, Ltd..(Kahn, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Daniel L. Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312643. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Oxo International, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Moffett, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffett, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR OXO INTERNATIONAL, LTD. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the Parties, subject to the approval of the Court, that the date upon which Oxo is required to move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff'sComplaint is extended until August 19, 2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, this 19th day of July, 2019, that the Stipulation is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/19/2019) Oxo International, Ltd. answer due 8/19/2019. (ks)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Umbra LLC. (Graif, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Oxo International, Ltd. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by designated agent Michelle Robinson, Texas Secretary of State. Document filed by Umbra LLC. (Graif, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (sj)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oxo International, Ltd.. (sj)
June 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Michael Robert Graif re: Document No. #4 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Docket Number field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form was not completed by the attorney. Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies. (sj)
June 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Robert Graif. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Oxo International, Ltd.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for additional pleading submitted to court for review.(Graif, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Graif, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OXO International, Ltd, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Umbra LLC. (Graif, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OXO INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17140943)Document filed by Umbra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Graif, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umbra LLC v. Oxo International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umbra LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Graif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXO INTERNATIONAL, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxo International, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel L. Moffett
Represented By: Colin Phillips
Represented By: Michael P. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?