Flint de Castro et al v. NYU Hospitals Center et al
Plaintiff: LOTOYA LEWIN, LORI-ANN FOSTER, NADIA LUBMAN, MAISHA DIXON, PAULINA FLINT DE CASTRO, LEAH PETRILLO, JENNIE HSU, Sharon Jenkins, CHRISTINE MCKOY, CRISTINE SERRANO and Maisha Dickson
Defendant: John Does 1-50, NYU Hospitals Center, John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center doing business as NYU Langone Medical Center and NYU School of Medicine
Case Number: 1:2019cv05957
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Maisha Dickson ("Dickson") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Dickson against NYU In this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Maisha Dickson terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/24/2021) (ate)
November 24, 2021 Filing 81 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Maisha Dickson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Brehm, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Sharon Jenkins ("Jenkins") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Jenkins against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Sharon Jenkins terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (ate)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Cristine Serrano ("Serrano") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University' (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Serrano against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Cristine Serrano terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (jca)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Paulina Flint De Castro ("De Castro") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by De Castro against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Paulina Flint de Castro terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (ate)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Lotoya Lewin ("Lewin") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Lewin against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (jca)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Nadia Lubman ("Lubman") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Lubman against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Nadia Lubman terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (ate)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Christine McKoy ("McKay") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by McKay against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (kv)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Jennie Hsu ("Hsu") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Hsu against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Jennie Hsu terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (ate)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Lori-Anne Foster ("Foster") and Defendants NYU Langone Hopsitals f/k/a NYU Hospitals Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Foster against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Party Lori-Ann Foster terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (vfr) Modified on 11/19/2021 (vfr).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Treating Plaintiffs letter at docket number 71 as a motion to amend the caption, the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to amend the caption to correct the spelling of one of the Plaintiffs' last names. Plaintiff Maisha Dixon shall be changed to Maisha Dickson. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/19/2021) (jca)
November 18, 2021 Filing 71 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mason A. Barney dated November 18, 2021 re: Stipulation of Dismissal for Maisha Dickson. Document filed by Maisha Dixon..(Barney, Mason)
November 18, 2021 Filing 70 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Sharon Jenkins. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 Filing 69 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Paulina Flint de Castro. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 Filing 68 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Nadia Lubman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 Filing 67 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Lotoya Lewin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 Filing 66 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Lori-Ann Foster. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 Filing 65 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jennie Hsu. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 Filing 64 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Cristine Serrano. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 Filing 63 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Does 1 through 50, NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Christine McKoy. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Herzberg, Aliza)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #63 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #69 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #68 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #67 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #65 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #64 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #66 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #70 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
November 17, 2021 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Paulina Flint de Castro. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 Filing 61 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Cristine Serrano. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 Filing 60 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Christine McKoy. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 Filing 59 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Nadia Lubman. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 Filing 58 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Sharon Jenkins. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 Filing 57 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Jennie Hsu. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 Filing 56 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Lori-Ann Foster. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Maisha Dixon. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Herzberg, Aliza) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km).
November 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Aliza Herzberg. RE-FILE Document No. #55 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected (do not select all defendants or all parties. Please select each individual party that is being dismissed. The stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). The Plaintiff's name on the document is spelled differently than it is on the docket. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
November 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Aliza Herzberg. RE-FILE Document No. #59 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #56 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #60 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #58 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #57 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #61 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #62 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. When refiling, do not select that the dismissal is to all parties or all defendants. Please select each individual party that you are dismissing. The stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled for November 4, 2021 at 2:00PM is CANCELLED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
October 28, 2021 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Amy J. Traub dated October 28, 2021 re: Settlement. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine..(Traub, Amy)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Leah Petrillo ("Petrillo ") and Defendants NYU Langone Hospitals f/k/a NYU Hospitials Center and NYU School of Medicine, a division of New York University (collectively, "NYU"), hereby stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice of all causes of action asserted by Petrillo against NYU in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/23/2021) (va)
September 23, 2021 Filing 52 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Leah Petrillo..(Herzberg, Aliza)
September 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Status Conference held on 9/10/2021 by Telephone Conference. Aaron Siri present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Amy Traub present by telephone for Defendants. Next Status Conference set for November 4, 2021 at 2:00PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this case on September 10, 2021. The parties are directed to mediate again through their private mediator. The next status conference in this case is scheduled for November 4, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The conference will proceed remotely by telephone. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. By October 28, 2021, the parties must file a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order for any plaintiffs in the case that have not reached settlement. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/10/2021) (vfr)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled for tomorrow, September 10, 2021 at 3:00PM will proceed remotely by telephone. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
July 16, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
July 16, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Status Conference held on 7/16/2021 by Telephone Conference. Aaron Siri and Mason Barney present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Priya Amin present by telephone for Defendants. Next Status Conference set for September 10, 2021 at 3:00PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
July 15, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priya Amin on behalf of NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine..(Amin, Priya)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying #48 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties should be prepared to discuss what progress they have made on settlement, what more needs to be done, and whether they consent to a 60-day order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
July 15, 2021 Filing 48 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on July 16, 2021 addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mason A. Barney and Amy Traub dated July 15, 2021. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Barney, Mason)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status Conference is rescheduled to July 16, 2021 at 3:00PM. Any previously scheduled case management conference is cancelled. Parties are reminded to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. If the case is not settled within 45 days, the Court will reopen discovery and set a new date by which all discovery will need to be completed. Status Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
May 27, 2021 Filing 46 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mason A. Barney dated May 27, 2021. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Barney, Mason)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status Conference is rescheduled to June 1, 2021 at 11:00AM. Parties are reminded to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. Status Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
April 26, 2021 Filing 44 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Status Conference) addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Amy J. Traub dated April 26, 2021. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine..(Traub, Amy)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Status Conference previously set for April 27, 2021 is RESCHEDULED to April 29, 2021 at 11:00AM. Parties are reminded to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
April 23, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status Conference is rescheduled to April 27, 2021 at 2:00PM. Parties are reminded to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. Status Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
March 26, 2021 Filing 42 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for April 6, 2021 addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Amy J. Traub dated March 26, 2021. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine..(Traub, Amy)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Rachel Meese to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Jessica Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting re: #37 Letter Request to Temporarily Stay All Deadlines by 60 Days. All deadlines are Stayed. The Telephone Conference scheduled for tomorrow, January 27, 2021 is CANCELED. Parties are to submit a status letter in 60 days. Status Conference set for April 6, 2021 at 2:00PM. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER withdrawing #30 Letter Motion to Compel without prejudice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
January 26, 2021 Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mason A. Barney dated January 26, 2021 re: Withdrawal of Motion to Compel and Request to Temporarily Stay All Deadlines by 60 Days. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Barney, Mason)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER The parties are ORDERED, by 6:00 p.m. today, January 26, 2021, to file a letter on ECF and to send a corresponding email to the Court's Chambers email address indicating whether the discovery dispute raised at Dkt. No. 30 is unresolved and if the conference scheduled for tomorrow, January 27, 2021, should proceed as scheduled. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (wt)
January 22, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Rachel Meese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23647368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Rachel Meese signed affidavit, #2 Supplement Attorney Rachel Meese Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Meese, Rachel)
January 22, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Rachel Meese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23647368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 14, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Jessica Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23510303. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Jessica Wallace Signed Affidavit, #2 Supplement Attorney Jessica Wallace Certoficate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order).(Wallace, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Jessica Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23510303. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference motion GRANTED. The conference scheduled for today, January 6, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED and will be held instead on January 27, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. using the same dial-in information. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (wt) Modified on 1/6/2021 (mf).
January 6, 2021 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Production addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mason A. Barney dated January 6, 2021. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Barney, Mason)
January 6, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the discovery dispute, at Dkt. Nos. 30-31, on Wednesday, January 6, 2021 from 3:00 - 3:30 p.m. At that date and time the parties are directed to dial the Court's conference line at 888-251-2909 (access code: 2123101). The parties are directed to meet and confer in advance of the hearing to attempt to resolve the dispute without the Court's intervention. The parties were also notified of this conference by email on Thursday, December 31, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (wt)
January 4, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
December 30, 2020 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Amy J. Traub dated December 30, 2020 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' December 28, 2020 Rule 37 Letter Motion to Compel the Production of Certain Documents. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine..(Traub, Amy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendant NYU Hospitals d/b/a/ NYU Langone Medical Center to Produce Documents addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Elizabeth A. Brehm dated December 28, 2020. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Brehm, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Please note that the corrected date for the post-discovery case management conference is July 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. MEMORANDUM ENDORSED. The Court GRANTS the requested extensions with the following amendments: (1) The parties need not file any pre-motion conference letters in advance of the post-discovery case management conference; (2) The postdiscovery case management conference shall take place on July 8, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 3/12/2021. Discovery due by 6/24/2021. Motions due by 8/16/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2021. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/23/2020) (va)
October 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 6/10/2021. Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2021. (va)
October 20, 2020 Filing 28 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of All Future Discovery Deadlines addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mason A. Barney dated October 20, 2020. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Barney, Mason)
October 8, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Ann Brehm on behalf of Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Brehm, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. MEMORANDUM ENDORSED. The deadlines proposed in the table above are adopted. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 11/12/2020. Discovery due by 2/22/2021. Motions due by 4/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/10/2021. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/31/2020) (va)
July 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 2/8/2021. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/10/2021. (va)
July 17, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of All Future Discovery Deadlines addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Amy J. Traub dated July 17, 2020. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine..(Traub, Amy)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/13/2020) (va)
July 6, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Discovery / Request to Enter Protective Order addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mason A. Barney dated July 6, 2020. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Redline of Edits).(Barney, Mason)
March 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Siri on behalf of Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Siri, Aaron)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed no later than 5/9/2020. Fact Discovery due by 10/2/2021. Depositions shall be completed by 8/14/2020. Expert Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Deposition due by 11/9/2020. Discovery due by 11/23/2020. Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2021. Motions due by 1/15/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 15 to 20 days. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/20/2020) (va)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It is hereby: ORDERED that there shall be a post-discovery case management conference on December 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15C of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. In advance of the conference and no later than December 7, 2020, any party intending to move for summary judgment shall file on ECF a letter, not to exceed three pages in length, setting forth the basis for the anticipated summary judgment motion, including the legal standards and elements governing the claims at issue. Any party intending to oppose that motion shall file on ECF a letter, not to exceed three pages in length, setting forth anticipated arguments in opposition by December 14, 2020. The content and timing for any anticipated motions for summary judgment will be discussed at the December 21, 2020 status conference. The deadline for submission of a Joint Pretrial Order is February 8, 2021. Trial is hereby scheduled to begin on February 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 12/7/2020. Responses due by 12/14/2020 Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/20/2020) (kv)
February 19, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/19/2020. Aliza Herzberg present for Plaintiffs. Amy Traub present for Defendants. Status conference set for December 21, 2020 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 15C before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine..(Traub, Amy)
February 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aliza F. Herzberg on behalf of Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro..(Herzberg, Aliza)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This case has been randomly reassigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for February 12, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby ADJOURNED and shall instead take place on February 19, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 15C of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by February 14, 2020 by 5:00 p.m., the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, and as further specified and set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15C, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman). (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/11/2020) (rjm)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge George B. Daniels is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Maisha Dixon, Lori-Ann Foster, Jennie Hsu, Sharon Jenkins, Lotoya Lewin, Nadia Lubman, Christine McKoy, Leah Petrillo, Cristine Serrano, Paulina Flint de Castro. (Barney, Mason)
November 13, 2019 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Counsel's Office.(ah)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter filed by NYU Hospitals Center. ENDORSEMENT: The initial conference is adjourned from November 13, 2019 to February 12, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/7/2019) (jwh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Amy J. Traub dated November 6, 2019 re: Adjournment of Initial Pre-trial Conference. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center.(Traub, Amy)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/21/2019.(mf)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine.(Traub, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine.(Traub, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo on behalf of NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Saima Zuberi Sheikh on behalf of NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine. (Sheikh, Saima)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Joy Traub on behalf of NYU Hospitals Center, NYU School of Medicine. (Traub, Amy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NYU Hospitals Center waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Document filed by Lotoya Lewin; Lori-Ann Foster; Nadia Lubman; Leah Petrillo; Maisha Dixon; Christine McKoy; Paulina Flint de Castro; Jennie Hsu; Cristine Serrano; Sharon Jenkins. (Barney, Mason)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/26/2019) (jca)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYU Hospitals Center. (dnh)
June 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mason Adams Barney. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LOTOYA LEWIN, LORI-ANN FOSTER, NADIA LUBMAN, LEAH PETRILLO, MAISHA DIXON, CHRISTINE MCKOY, PAULINA FLINT DE CASTRO, JENNIE HSU, CRISTINE SERRANO, John Does 1-50, NYU Hospitals Center. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
June 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mason Adams Barney. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 890 (Other Statutory Actions); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
June 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYU HOSPITALS CENTER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MAISHA DIXON, PAULINA FLINT DE CASTRO, LORI-ANN FOSTER, JENNIE HSU, Sharon Jenkins, LOTOYA LEWIN, NADIA LUBMAN, CHRISTINE MCKOY, LEAH PETRILLO, CRISTINE SERRANO. (Barney, Mason)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Barney, Mason)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-50, NYU Hospitals Center. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17141409)Document filed by LOTOYA LEWIN, LORI-ANN FOSTER, NADIA LUBMAN, LEAH PETRILLO, MAISHA DIXON, CHRISTINE MCKOY, PAULINA FLINT DE CASTRO, JENNIE HSU, CRISTINE SERRANO, Sharon Jenkins.(Barney, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flint de Castro et al v. NYU Hospitals Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOTOYA LEWIN
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI-ANN FOSTER
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADIA LUBMAN
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAISHA DIXON
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULINA FLINT DE CASTRO
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH PETRILLO
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIE HSU
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jenkins
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE MCKOY
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTINE SERRANO
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maisha Dickson
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Aliza F. Herzberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: Jessica Wallace
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Represented By: Mason Adams Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Hospitals Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Hospitals Center doing business as NYU Langone Medical Center
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo
Represented By: Priya Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU School of Medicine
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo
Represented By: Priya Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?